blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1070835

EP1070835 - Can structure for a catalytic converter and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Toshio, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture, 467-8530 / JP
02 / Hijikata, Toshihiko, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture, 467-8530 / JP
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00306239.521.07.2000
[2001/04]
Priority number, dateJP1999020726522.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20726599
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1070835
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1070835
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:F01N3/28
[2001/04]
CPC:
F01N3/2853 (EP,US); F01N2330/06 (EP,US); F01N2350/06 (EP,US);
F01N2450/02 (EP,US); Y10T29/49345 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/41]
Former [2001/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Umhüllungsstruktur für einen katalytischen Konverter und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2001/04]
English:Can structure for a catalytic converter and manufacturing method thereof[2001/04]
French:Structure enveloppante pour catalyseur et procédé d'élaboration de celle-ci[2001/04]
Examination procedure30.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
13.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2002Fee for grant paid
31.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4142864  (ROSYNSKY VICTOR, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0363681  (ROTH TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0639700  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [A]EP0643204  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19509029  (FORD WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.