Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1079296

EP1079296 - Electronically steerable embedded laptop computer antenna array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Honcharenko, Walter
21 Woodgate Drive
Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00306258.524.07.2000
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateUS1999037033606.08.1999         Original published format: US 370336
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1079296
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, H01Q1/22
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektronisch steuerbarer Antennenarray, der in einem tragbaren Rechner eingebettet ist[2001/09]
English:Electronically steerable embedded laptop computer antenna array[2001/09]
French:Reseau d' antennes à commande électronique incorporé dans un ordinateur portable[2001/09]
Examination procedure03.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/19]
18.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200203   M06   Not yet paid