Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076469

EP1076469 - Optical wavelength-space cross connect switch architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fatehi, Mohammad Taghi
5 Sylvia Terrace
Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US
02 / Knox, Wayne Harvey
165 Crawfords Corner Road
Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/07]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00306518.231.07.2000
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateUS1999037082409.08.1999         Original published format: US 370824
[2001/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1076469
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1076469
Date:08.10.2003
[2003/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076469
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/00
[2001/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/27]
Former [2001/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Architektur eines optischen Wellenlängen-Raumquerverbindungsfeldes[2001/07]
English:Optical wavelength-space cross connect switch architecture[2001/07]
French:Architecture de brasseur optique spatial à longueur d' ondes[2001/07]
Examination procedure27.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/22]
09.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2010Fee for grant paid
05.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination01.06.2006Appeal received No.  T1247/06
22.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2008Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
18.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT19.05.2010
[2011/14]
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH09189926  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * figures 1,5 * [A] 2-4,6-15;
 US5973809  [ ] [ ] * figures 20,24 *;
 [XA]JPH09127560  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * figures 8,13,17 * [A] 2-4,6-15;
 US6097517  [ ] [ ] * figures 8,13,17 *;
 [PX]US5973809  (OKAYAMA HIDEAKI) [PX] 1,5 * figures 20,24 *;
 [E]US6097517  (OKAYAMA HIDEAKI) [E] 1,5 * figures 8,13,17 *
 [XA]  - JUE J P ET AL, "A NEW MODE ARCHITECTURE FOR SCALABLE WDM OPTICAL NETWORKS", ICC '99. 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE RECORD. VANCOUVER, CA, JUNE 6 - 10, 1999, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19990606), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-5285-8, pages 1714 - 1718, XP000903663 [X] 1,5 * figure 2 * [A] 2-4,6-15
 [A]  - MISAWA A ET AL, "WDM KNOCKOUT SWITCH WITH MULTI-OUTPUT-PORT WAVELENGTH-CHANNEL SELECTORS", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (199812), vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 2212 - 2219, XP000833965 [A] 1-15 * figures 4-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.736587
 [DA]  - AL-SALAMEH D Y ET AL, "OPTICAL NETWORKING", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, WILEY, CA, US, (1998), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1089-7089, pages 39 - 61, XP000750436 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.2092
 [DA]  - SADOT D ET AL, "TUNABLE OPTICAL FILTERS FOR DENSE WDM NETWORKS", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (19981201), vol. 36, no. 12, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 50 - 55, XP000800987 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.735877