Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1076469 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1076469



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 299
25.03.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
05.03.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
12.02.2010 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Description Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
22.01.2010 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
21.01.2010 Description Search / examination 1
21.01.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.11.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
29.07.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
20.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
20.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
20.07.2009 Description Search / examination 1
20.07.2009 Description Search / examination 1
20.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.06.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.06.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.02.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.02.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
24.09.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.09.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
20.06.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
17.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.06.2008 Claims Appeal 4
16.06.2008 Claims Appeal 4
16.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.05.2008 Claims Appeal 3
28.05.2008 Claims Appeal 3
28.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.05.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
31.03.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
14.03.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.01.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.10.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
04.09.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.08.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.07.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.07.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.06.2006 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
21.06.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
08.06.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.06.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.04.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.04.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.04.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.04.2006 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.04.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
07.04.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
16.01.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.12.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
14.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
14.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
14.12.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
09.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
09.12.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.03.2005 (Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 4
21.03.2005 (Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 4
21.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 (Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 3
17.09.2004 (Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 2
17.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.08.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.08.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.08.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
04.01.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.07.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
31.07.2000 Description Search / examination 15
31.07.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2000 Drawings Search / examination 7
31.07.2000 Priority document Search / examination 34
31.07.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6