Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077037

EP1077037 - Seat belt buckle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Korea Corporation
395-70 Shindaebang-dong, Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
Delphi Korea Co., Ltd.
395-70 Shindaebang-dong, Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
Delphi Automotive Systems Sungwoo Corporation
395-70 Shindaebang-dong, Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
Delphi Automotive Systems Sungwoo Co., Ltd.
1316-17 Seocho-dong, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-070 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Jae-Ho
667-8 Ahyun-2Dong
Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-012 / KR
02 / Lee, Jong-Hoon
12-15 Anam-Dong 5GA
Seongbuk-Gu, Seoul 136-075 / KR
 [2004/44]
Former [2001/08]01 / Lee, Jae-Ho
667-8 Ahyun-2Dong
Mapu-gu, Seoul 121-012 / KR
02 / Lee, Jong-Hoon
12-15 Anam-Dong 5GA
Seongbuk-Gu, Seoul 136-075 / KR
Representative(s)Orr, William McLean
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Orr, William McLean
URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date00306524.031.07.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateKR1999003376917.08.1999         Original published format: KR 9933769
KR1999005249624.11.1999         Original published format: KR 9952496
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077037
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1077037
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077037
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A44B11/25
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/21]
Former [2001/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsgurtschloss[2001/08]
English:Seat belt buckle[2001/08]
French:Boucle de ceinture de sécurité[2001/08]
Examination procedure03.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
05.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2004Fee for grant paid
30.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200203   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0341839  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [DA] 1-11 * page 5, column 8, lines 17-22; figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4928366  (BALLET JEAN-NOEL [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4562625  (DOTY GERALD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 44-52; figure 6; claims 1,6 *