EP1079311 - Method and system for creating web-quality online documentation from the same source file as printed documentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304-1112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathews, Meredith D. 2365 5th Court SW Loveland, CO 80537 / US | 02 /
Loughlin, Paul M. 3139 Cockney Street Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306609.9 | 03.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | US19990382857 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: US 382857 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1079311 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1079311 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/21 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
G06F40/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Erstellen von Online-Dokumentation in Internet-Qualität ausgehend von der selben Quelldatei wie für die Druck-Dokumentation | [2001/09] | English: | Method and system for creating web-quality online documentation from the same source file as printed documentation | [2001/09] | French: | Méthode et système pour la création de documentation en ligne en qualité Internet à partir du fichier source de la documentation imprimée | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - DAN EMORY, "FM+SGML Information Design", ADOBE DOCUMENTATION, (1998), pages 1 - 22, URL: http://www.infocon.com/images/SGML_InfoDesign.pdf, (20030114), XP002227643 [X] 1-10 * page 13, paragraph 6.2.1 - lines 2-4 * * page 13, paragraph 6.2.2 - lines 1-8 * * page 15, paragraph 6.2.3 - lines 17-38 * | [A] - PARIS N, "STYLESHEET DRIVEN SGML TRANSFORMATION", PROCEEDINGS OF SGML/XML EUROPE. FROM THEORY TO NEW PRACTICES, XX, XX, (1998), pages 167 - 172, XP001009619 [A] 1-7 * page 1, lines 1,2,16,17 * * page 1, lines 19-21,26-32 * * page 2, lines 30-32 * * page 3, lines 7,8 * * page 4, lines 14-21 * * page 6, lines 31-36 * * page 7, lines 7-10 * | [A] - ADOBE, "Adobe FrameMaker 5.5.6", ADOBE DOCUMENTATION, pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.adobe.com/products/framemaker/pdfs/frmcorppub.pdf, (20030114), XP002227644 [A] 1-10 * page 1, lines 22-24 * * page 2, lines 15-19,22-24 * * page 3, lines 11-15,22-25 * * page 4, lines 24-26,31-34 * * page 5, lines 18-20 * |