Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074945

EP1074945 - Method and apparatus for controlling compressed Z information in a video graphics system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.12.2005  [2005/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATI International SRL
Beaumont House Hastings
Christ Church / BB
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
ATI International SRL
Beaumont House Hastings
Christ Church / BB
Inventor(s)01 / Morein, Steven L.
10 Magazine Street, Apt. 801
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
02 / Wright, Michael T.
40-8 Briarwood Lane
Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752-2518 / US
03 / Yee, Kin M.
129 Highland Avenue
Quincy, Massachusetts 02170 / US
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven
Marks & Clerk
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]Howe, Steven
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date00306650.304.08.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateUS1999036973006.08.1999         Original published format: US 369730
[2001/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1074945
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1074945
Date:08.05.2002
[2002/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074945
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/40
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/05]
Former [2001/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Steuerung von komprimierter Z-Information in einem Videographiksystem[2001/06]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling compressed Z information in a video graphics system[2001/06]
French:Méthode et appareil pour commander l'information Z comprimée dans un système graphique video[2001/06]
Examination procedure31.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
11.11.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.03.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
03.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2004Fee for grant paid
08.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.12.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.12.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5808618  (KAWANO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9,16-18 * column 1, line 42 - line 45 * * column 2, line 61 - line 64 *;
 [A]JPH08123980  ;
 [A]JPH0636045
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, [A] 1-3,8,9,16-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940518), vol. 018, no. 261, Database accession no. (P - 1739), [A] 1-3,8,9,16,18 * abstract *