EP1075041 - Antenna device and portable radio set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawamura, Masatoshi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kanayama, Yoshiki, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Saito, Yuichiro, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306677.6 | 03.08.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | JP19990224265 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22426599 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1075041 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1075041 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/36, H01Q9/30, H01Q21/28, H04B7/04 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01P5/10 (KR);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/244 (EP,US);
H01Q1/362 (EP,US);
H01Q9/30 (EP,US);
H04B7/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/06] | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/36, H01Q9/30, H01Q21/28, H04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/50] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antennenanordnung und tragbares Funkgerät | [2001/06] | English: | Antenna device and portable radio set | [2001/06] | French: | Dispositif d'antenne et appareil radio portable | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/30] | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60240201 ; | [A]EP0218843 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0798878 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]US5703602 (CASEBOLT MATTHEW PHILLIP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 55 *; | [Y]GB2320816 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 21 * * page 13, line 22 - page 15, line 10; figures 1,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860416), vol. 010, no. 099, Database accession no. (E - 396), & JP60240201 A 19851129 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |