EP1076266 - Black toner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORPORATION 1-2, Funairiminami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Toda Kogyo Corporation 1-2, Funairiminami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Kazuyuki 6-34-43-20, Kawauchi, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Morii, Hiroko 5-5, Teramachi, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Yasuyuki 2-9-1-405, Akasaki Onoda-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 04 /
Ishitani, Seiji 21-3, Asahien, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306818.6 | 10.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | JP19990227826 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22782699 | JP20000131864 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000131864 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076266 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/09 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
G03G9/0838 (EP);
G03G9/0839 (EP);
G03G9/0902 (EP);
G03G9/0904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [2001/44] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schwarzer Toner | [2001/07] | English: | Black toner | [2001/07] | French: | Révélateur noir | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0297968 ; | [A]JPS55147638 ; | [A]EP0453261 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0582472 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]US5324571 (KOYAMA NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 15, line 1 - line 18 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 20, Database accession no. 1990-152560, XP002149694 & JPH0297968 A 19900410 (CANON) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810207), vol. 5, no. 21, Database accession no. (P - 048), & JP55147638 A 19801117 (CANON) [A] 1 * abstract * |