Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081401

EP1081401 - Multi-disk device having forced lubrication on demand [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3001 West Big Beaver Road Suite 200 P.O. Box 5060
Troy MI 48007-5060 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200
Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kremer, John M.
13873 Diversion
Sterling Heights, MI 48313 / US
02 / McCrary, Paul T.
219 East Huron River Dr.
Belleville, MI 48111 / US
03 / Martin, Keith R.
1928 Shagbark Lane, Apartment No. 201
Imlay City, MI 48444 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Hedges, Martin Nicholas , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Hedges, Martin Nicholas , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date00306831.910.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateUS1999037940624.08.1999         Original published format: US 379406
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1081401
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1081401
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16D25/0638, F16D25/12
[2001/10]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/04]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lamellenreibkupplung mit Zwangsschmierung auf Anfrage[2001/10]
English:Multi-disk device having forced lubrication on demand[2001/10]
French:Embrayage à friction multidisque avec lubrification forcée par demande[2001/10]
Examination procedure03.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/37]
09.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PXD]EP0987459  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [PXD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2586769  (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US3823802  (WINZELER J, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2837192  (DUNKELOW HENRY J) [A] 1 * column 2, line 69 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4759432  (JUERGENS GUNTER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 58; figure 1 *