Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1079252

EP1079252 - Apparatus and method for laterally displacing an optical signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shahid, Muhammed Afzal
2880 Manor Brook Court
Snellville, Georgia 30078 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2002/12]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Former [2001/09]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00306928.314.08.2000
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateUS1999038648925.08.1999         Original published format: US 386489
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1079252
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1079252
Date:07.07.2004
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42, G02B6/28
[2004/28]
Former International [2001/09]G02B6/42, G02B6/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum seitlichen Versetzen eines optischen Signals[2001/09]
English:Apparatus and method for laterally displacing an optical signal[2001/09]
French:Dispositif et méthode pour le déplacement latéral d'un signal optique[2001/09]
Examination procedure29.07.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2330425  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, line L * * page 6, paragraph L; figures 4,5 *;
 [X]JPS6271917  ;
 [X]US4730882  (MESSERSCHMIDT ROBERT G [US]) [X] 1-7 * figure 1; claim 3 *;
 [X]US4626065  (MORI KEI [JP]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4643521  (HARSTEAD EDWARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 40 - line 54; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0661571  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 6, line 12 - line 16; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4516828  (STEELE ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *;
 [X]US5724151  (RYLEY JAMES FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870903), vol. 011, no. 270, Database accession no. (P - 611), [X] 1-7 * abstract *