EP1081860 - Single gate oxide output buffer stage with a cascaded transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATI International SRL Beaumont House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states ATI International SRL Beaumont House Hastings Christ Church / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drapkin, Oleg 6020 Bathurst Street No.905 North York, Ontario MR2 1Z8 / CA | 02 /
Temkine, Grigori 125 Neptune Drive No. 404 Toronto, Ontario M6A 1X3 / CA | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306939.0 | 14.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990379197 | 20.08.1999 Original published format: US 379197 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081860 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081860 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/0185, H03K19/003 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H03K19/018507 (EP,US);
H03K19/00315 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/48] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausgangstransistorschaltung mit einer einzigen Gateoxidschicht und einem Transistor in kaskadierter Schaltung | [2001/10] | English: | Single gate oxide output buffer stage with a cascaded transistor | [2001/10] | French: | Etage tampon de sortie avec des grilles à une seule couche d'oxyde et un transistor en cascade | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 08.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Request for further processing for: | 29.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10105307 ; | [A]US5467031 (NGUYEN TRUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]GB2313968 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 22, line 17 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0848498 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [XA]WO9832228 (XILINX INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-20 * abstract * * page 4, line 2 - line 16 * [A] 7,12; | [PXA]EP0961206 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [PX] 1-6,8-11,13-20 * column 5, line 16 - column 8, line 47 * * abstract * * column 4, line 19 - line 26 * [A] 7,12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10105307 A 19980424 (INTERNATL BUSINESS MACH CORP |