Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081875

EP1081875 - Aggregate power measurement and control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.11.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2009/02]For all designated states
Lucent Technologies Inc.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Eibling, Edward Ellis
138 Woodland Avenue
Convent Station, New Jersey 07961 / US
02 / Ko, Kyung Hwan
35 Crown Court Drive
Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US
03 / Zhu, Lily
18 Braemar Court
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
 [2001/16]
Former [2001/10]01 / Eibling, Edward Ellis
138 Woodland Avenue
Convent Station, New Jersey 07961 / US
02 / Ko, Kyung Hwan
23 Alexandra Way
Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US
03 / Zhu, Lily
18 Braemar Court
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/25]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/10]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00307184.221.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateUS1999038572530.08.1999         Original published format: US 385725
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1081875
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1081875
Date:09.07.2003
[2003/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1081875
Date:07.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005, H04B17/00
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2004/14]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Messung und Regelung von Leistungsaggregat[2001/10]
English:Aggregate power measurement and control[2001/10]
French:Mesure et commande d'agrégat de puissance[2001/10]
Examination procedure22.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
22.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2008Fee for grant paid
03.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI07.01.2009
SE07.04.2009
[2009/37]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5893035  (CHEN TAO) [A] 1 * abstract *; column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 5 * * column 6, line 11 - line 64 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9824198  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY ;HAEKKINEN HANNU (FI); SALONAHO OSCAR) [A] 1 * abstract *; page 3, line 2 - line 18 * * page 5, line 24 - line 35 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 1 *;
 [A]US5842114  (OZLUTURK FAITH M) [A] 1 * abstract *; column 2, line 19 - line 35 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 11 * * figure 3 *