Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1079194

EP1079194 - Method for preventing plate type heat exchanger from blockage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirao, Harunori
448-2, Waku, Absoshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1227 / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Yukihiro
1-45, Goshikiyama 1-chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0035 / JP
03 / Nakahara, Sei
448-1-1-509, Waku, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1227 / JP
04 / Dodo, Osamu
255-54, Shinzaike, Ibogawa-cho
Ibo-gun, Hyogo 671-1611 / JP
05 / Mitsumoto, Tetsuji
241-1, Ebisu, Shikama-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 672-8057 / JP
06 / Nishimura, Takeshi
169-9, Kamigawara, Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1263 / JP
07 / Sakamoto, Kazuhiko
25-5, Taderahigashi 4-chome
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0081 / JP
08 / Iwato, Hiroo
15-25, Mitachinishi 1-chome
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0074 / JP
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Jump, Timothy John Simon
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Jump, Timothy John Simon
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date00307229.522.08.2000
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateJP1999023564823.08.1999         Original published format: JP 23564899
JP2000004933925.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000049339
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1079194
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1079194
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1079194
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F28F19/00, F28F27/02, F28D9/00
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE [2002/36]
Former [2001/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verhinderung von Verstopfungen in einem Plattenwärmetauscher[2001/09]
English:Method for preventing plate type heat exchanger from blockage[2001/09]
French:Méthode pour empêcher le blocage d'un échangeur de chaleur à plaques[2001/09]
Examination procedure23.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
13.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2003Fee for grant paid
16.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.07.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB1468410  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,11 * page 3, line 54 - line 60 * * page 3, line 101 - line 103; figure - * [Y] 3,4,8,9;
 [XY]DE3511037  (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [X] 12 * abstract * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 14; figure - * [Y] 3,4,13,15,16;
 [Y]US5266291  (DRNEVICH RAYMOND F [US], et al) [Y] 8,9,13,15,16 * column 2, line 12 - line 17 * * column 8, line 4 - line 10 *;
 [A]US5444130  (OHNISHI SHUJI [US], et al) [A] 8-16 * column 4, line 36 - line 64 *;
 [A]EP0926161  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 7-10,13-16 * column 2, line 14 - line 20 * * column 6, line 42 - line 45 *;
 [A]EP0895051  (D APPLIC THERMIQUES C I A T CO [FR]) [A] 3,4,12 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH0735492