Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080889

EP1080889 - Method and apparatus fpr controlling pressure applied to printing material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi Chiryu-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[2009/09]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Isogai, Takeyoshi, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Adachi, Jun, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Saito, Tatsumi, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Mizuno, Manabu, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Murray, Elisabeth Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/33]Murray, Elisabeth Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2001/10]Moir, Michael Christopher , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date00307638.704.09.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateJP1999025163406.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25163499
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1080889
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1080889
Date:06.02.2002
[2002/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080889
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:B41F15/42, H05K3/12
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/43]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des auf Druckmaterial ausgeübten Pressdrucks[2001/10]
English:Method and apparatus fpr controlling pressure applied to printing material[2001/10]
French:Méthode et dispositif de réglage de la pression exercée sur materiaux d'impression[2001/10]
Examination procedure09.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
02.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
29.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2009Fee for grant paid
05.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
FR30.09.2009
[2011/14]
Former [2010/35]NL25.02.2009
FR30.09.2009
Former [2009/34]NL25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH0848024  ;
 [A]US4636406  (LEICHT JOHN L [US]) [A] 1,8,13,16,17,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4622239  (SCHOENTHALER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,8,13,16,17,20 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [DA] 1,8,13,16,17,20 * abstract *
ExaminationUS4023487
 US4817524
by applicantUS4023487
 US4817524