Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1085044

EP1085044 - Method for recycling thermoset epoxy resin materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/12]Method for recycling thermosetting resin materials
[2004/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tai, Cao Minh, Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Gotanda, Takeshi, Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Tsuda, Ken, Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date00307880.512.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateJP1999025959613.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25959699
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1085044
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1085044
Date:18.04.2001
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1085044
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08J11/28, C08G59/50
[2001/16]
Former International [2001/12]C08J11/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/02]
Former [2001/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Wiederverwertung von wärmegehärteten Epoxidmaterialien[2004/34]
English:Method for recycling thermoset epoxy resin materials[2004/34]
French:Procédé pour recycler les matériaux thermodurcis de résine epoxide[2004/34]
Former [2001/12]Verfahren zur Wiederverwertung von wärmehärtenden Materialien
Former [2001/12]Method for recycling thermosetting resin materials
Former [2001/12]Procédé pour recycler les matériaux thermodurcis
Examination procedure11.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2005Fee for grant paid
17.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4552933  (SELLSTROM KATHY B [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claim 1 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 43 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 2 * * example 1 *;
 [X]JPH0790056  ;
 [XY]US5776989  (KUBOTA SHIZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 2, line 36 - line 60 * * column 3, line 20 - line 27 * * column 5, line 55 - line 57 * * examples 4,8,18 * * claims 1,12 * [Y] 1-17;
 [XY]WO9616112  (SEIJO BOLLIN HANS PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-10,16 * example 5 * [Y] 1-17
 [XY]  - SHUCHANG XUE ET AL, "PREPARATION OF EPOXY HARDENERS FROM WASTE RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAM AND THEIR APPLICATION", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE,US,JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. NEW YORK, (19950411), vol. 56, no. 2, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 127 - 134, XP000517083 [X] 1-17 * totality * [Y] 1-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1995.070560202
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, [X] 1-3 * abstract *