Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1089573

EP1089573 - Method of producing a stereoscopic image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2009
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.04.2009  [2009/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Graham
26 Tuckers Road
Faringdon, Oxfordshire SN7 7YG / GB
02 / Holliman, Nicholas Steven
59a Wood Street
Wallingford, Oxfordshire OX10 0AY / GB
03 / Lee, Delman
100 Church Road
Sandford-on-Thames, Oxford OX4 4YB / GB
 [2001/14]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date00307993.614.09.2000
[2001/14]
Priority number, dateGB1999002163815.09.1999         Original published format: GB 9921638
[2001/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1089573
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1089573
Date:02.07.2003
[2003/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1089573
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, G06T15/10
[2001/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/13]
Former [2001/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines stereoskopischen Bildes[2001/14]
English:Method of producing a stereoscopic image[2001/14]
French:Méthode de génération d'une image stéréoscopique[2001/14]
Examination procedure02.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/45]
21.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2008Fee for grant paid
22.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0751689  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
 [X]  - L. LIPTON, StereoGraphics: Developers' Handbook, 1997, STEREOGRAPHICS CORPORATION, XP002238679 [X] 1-15 * Chapt 2: Perceiving Stereoscopic Images Chapt 5: Parallel Lens Axes Cahpt 6: Creating Stereoscopic Software *