Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095676

EP1095676 - Method of creating image frames, storage medium and program executing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.07.2006  [2006/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kanetaka, Katsuyuki, Sony Comp. Entertainm. Inc.
1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
02 / Fukui, Toshio, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00308007.414.09.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999026113614.09.1999         Original published format: JP 26113699
JP2000023309201.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000233092
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1095676
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1095676
Date:16.11.2005
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/00, A63F13/10
[2005/46]
Former International [2001/18]A63F13/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildergenerierungsverfahren, Speichermedium und Programmausführungsvorrichtung[2001/18]
English:Method of creating image frames, storage medium and program executing apparatus[2001/18]
French:Méthode d'image creation, moyen de stockage et dispositif d'execution de programme[2001/18]
Examination procedure27.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
26.05.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH07328228  ;
 [A]US5938530  (WATANABE KUNIO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07328228 A 19951219 (SEGA ENTERP LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * claim 6 * * figures 4-6 *
 [A]  - TENG-SEE LOKE ET AL, "RENDERING FIREWORKS DISPLAYS", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19920501), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 0272-1716, pages 33 - 43, XP000281872 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.135912