Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1087140

EP1087140 - Screw-type pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A.
2, Via Felice Matteucci
50127 Firenze / IT
[2001/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Ferrari Aggradi, Gianpietro
Via Francesco Nullo, 11
50137 Firenze / IT
02 / Mezzedimi, Vasco
Viale Garibaldi, 20A
53036 Poggibonzi, Siena / IT
03 / Palarchi, Corrado
Via Andrea del Castagno, 10
50132 Firenze / IT
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Pedder, James Cuthbert
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date00308175.920.09.2000
[2001/13]
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0197823.09.1999         Original published format: IT MI991978
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1087140
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1087140
Date:17.04.2002
[2002/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1087140
Date:16.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:F04C2/16
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/02]
Former [2001/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schraubenpumpe[2001/13]
English:Screw-type pump[2001/13]
French:Pompe du type à vis[2001/13]
Examination procedure17.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
15.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2006Fee for grant paid
03.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6251724  ;
 [A]US2931310  (WALTON MUSSER C) [A] 1 * column 1, line 69 - column 2, line 54; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US3146717  (TYREE JR LEWIS) [A] 1 * column 1, line 10 - line 33 * * column 2, line 72 - column 4, line 13; figures 1,2 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870805), vol. 011, no. 238, Database accession no. (M - 613), [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract *