Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1093316

EP1093316 - Associated method for cell selection in a packet radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Kallio, Janne
Aijantie 24 C 5
33470 Ylojarvi / FI
02 / Pruuden, Peeter
Aleksanterinkatu 28 B 32
33100 Tampere / FI
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2001/16]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date00308241.920.09.2000
[2001/16]
Priority number, dateUS1999040567024.09.1999         Original published format: US 405670
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1093316
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1093316
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04L12/28, H04Q7/22
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/04]
Former [2001/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Assoziiertes Verfahren zur Zellselektion in einem Paketfunkkommunikationssystem.[2001/17]
English:Associated method for cell selection in a packet radio communication system[2001/16]
French:Procédé associé de sélection d'une cellule dans un réseau de communicationradio par paquets[2001/16]
Former [2001/16]Assozierte Verfahren zur Zellenauswahl in Paketfunksystem
Examination procedure10.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
12.07.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9948311  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 31 * * page 17, line 7 - page 25, line L *;
 [A]WO9628947  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1,16,20 * page 7, line 25 - page 10, line 16 *;
 [A]EP0848560  (ROLM SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 20 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 22 *