Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086964

EP1086964 - (Meth) acrylate copolymer pour point depressants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.06.2011
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Afton Chemical Intangibles LLC
330 South Fourth Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
[2006/48]
Former [2005/36]For all designated states
Afton Chemical Intangibles LLC
330 South Fourth Street Richmond
Virginia 23219 / US
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Ethyl Corporation
330 South Fourth Street, P.O. Box 2189
Richmond, Virginia 23218-2189 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Liesen, Gregory P.
8226 Meadowlake Road
Mechanicsville, Virginia 23111 / US
02 / Jao, Tze Chi
5619 Olde Hartley Way
Glen Allen, Virginia 23060 / US
03 / Li, Shoutian
1631 Upperbury Drive
Midlothian, Virginia 23113 / US
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00308259.121.09.2000
[2001/13]
Priority number, dateUS1999040169322.09.1999         Original published format: US 401693
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1086964
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1086964
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1086964
Date:29.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1086964
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/18, C10M145/14
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2003/12]
Former [2001/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:(Meth)acrylat Copolymere als Fliesspunkt-verringerndes Mittel[2001/13]
English:(Meth) acrylate copolymer pour point depressants[2001/13]
French:Copolymères de (meth)acrylates comme agent abaissant le point d'écoulement[2001/13]
Examination procedure13.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
28.12.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.04.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
10.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2006Fee for grant paid
25.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.08.2007  28.09.2010  WITHDRAWN
Evonik RohMax Additives GmbH
Kirschenallee
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schultheiss, Jürgen, et al
Hauptstrasse 17-19
Gebäude 6301A
55120 Mainz / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/44]
Opponent(s)01  10.08.2007  28.09.2010  WITHDRAWN
Evonik RohMax Additives GmbH
Kirschenallee
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schultheiss, Jürgen, et al
Hauptstrasse 17-19 Gebäude 6301A
55120 Mainz / DE
Former [2007/47]
Opponent(s)01  10.08.2007  22.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik RohMax Additives GmbH
Kirschenallee
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schultheiss, Jürgen, et al
Hauptstrasse 17-19 Gebäude 6301A
55120 Mainz / DE
Former [2007/38]
Opponent(s)01  10.08.2007   
Rohmax Additives GmbH
Kirschenallee
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schultheiss, Jürgen, et al
Hauptstrasse 17-19 Gebäude 6301A
55120 Mainz / DE
08.10.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.09.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.11.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
01.06.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.01.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.01.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE29.11.2006
[2007/31]
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5312884  (GORE ROBERT H [US], et al) [DX] 1-17 * claim 1 *;
 [DX]US4146492  (CUSANO CARMEN M, et al) [DX] 1-17 * column 1, line 59 - line 65; claim 1 * * column 4, line 51 - line 58 *;
 [X]US5368761  (GORE ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,5 *;
 [X]US4968444  (KNOELL HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 7, line 30 - line 46; claim 1 *;
 [X]US4867894  (PENNEWISS HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * example 2; claim 1 *