Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091281

EP1091281 - Computer peripheral unit communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yasuda, Yuichi, Alps Electric Co., Ltd
1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
02 / Yamagata, Kazuyoshi, Alps Electric Co., Ltd
1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
03 / Kuwabara, Isao, Alps Electric Inc.
5295 Hellger Avenue
San Jose, California 95135 / JP
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date00308412.626.09.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateJP1999028669207.10.1999         Original published format: JP 28669299
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091281
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091281
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091281
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033, G06F3/023
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/22]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssystem einer Rechnerperipherieeinheit[2001/15]
English:Computer peripheral unit communication system[2001/15]
French:Système de communication d'une unité périphérique d'ordinateur[2001/15]
Examination procedure16.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
18.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2004Fee for grant paid
02.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5049863  (OKA MAYUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 29 - line 47 * * figures 2,3,6-8 * * column 2, line 33 - line 63 * * column 4, line 1 - line 48 * * column 3, line 22 - line 45 * * column 5, line 14 - line 29 * [Y] 7,8;
 [XY]US5854621  (JUNOD PHILIPPE [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 13 - line 16 * * figures 4,6 * * column 2, line 10 - line 50 * * column 9, line 29 - column 9, line 38 * * column 4, line 13 - line 20 * * column 5, line 10 - line 16 * * column 6 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 18 * [Y] 8;
 [X]US5793359  (USHIKUBO YASUMI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 32 *;
 [X]US5136285  (OKUYAMA TOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 52 *;
 [Y]US5485614  (KOCIS THOMAS J [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 39 *;
 [A]US5890015  (GARNEY JOHN I [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 18 - line 47 * * column 6, line 3 - line 14 *