Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090586

EP1090586 - Methods and apparatus for cardiac imaging with conventional computed tomography [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hsieh, Jiang
19970 West Keswick Court
Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US
02 / Woloschek, Steven John
4596 Highview Drive
Franklin, Wisconsin 53122 / US
03 / Pan, Tin-Su
2710 Fieldside Court
Brookfield, Wisconsin 53005 / US
04 / Woodford, Mark
1029 Oxford Road
Waukesha, Wisocnsin 53188 / US
05 / Shen, Yun
City Hous 5-1403, 4-7-5, Asahigaoka
Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP
06 / Acharya, Kishore
1325 Ridgeway Road
Brookfield, Wisconsin 53005 / US
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date00308616.229.09.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateUS1999041015730.09.1999         Original published format: US 410157
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1090586
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1090586
Date:31.10.2001
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00, A61B6/03
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2002/29]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Herzbilddarstellung mit konventioneller errechneter Tomographie[2001/15]
English:Methods and apparatus for cardiac imaging with conventional computed tomography[2001/15]
French:Mèthode et appareil à l'imagerie cardiaque par tomographie classique assistée par ordinateur[2001/15]
Examination procedure02.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/28]
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
29.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/22]
11.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/22]
Divisional application(s)EP04016712.4  / EP1466559
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19740214  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 45; tables 1,2 * [A] 2,3,7,8;
 [A]US5383231  (YAMAGISHI ICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-8 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 36; table 2 *;
 [A]US4868747  (MORI ISSEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 3; tables 1-3,5,9 *;
 [A]US4182311  (HARELL GEORGE S [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 7 * * column 5, line 39 - column 9, line 24; tables 1-4 *;
 [A]US4641328  (FUJISE MASAKUNI [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 24 *;
 [A]US5271055  (HSIEH JIANG [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 51; tables 1-3 *