Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091575

EP1091575 - Improvements relating to an electronic programme guide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.10.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pace Plc
Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley
West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB
[2008/48]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Pace Micro Technology PLC
Victoria Road, Saltaire
Shipley, West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hoath, Bill
13 Banbhall Lane, Hale
Altrincham, Cheshire WA15 0LA / GB
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co LLP
1 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD / GB
Application number, filing date00308714.504.10.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateGB1999002350006.10.1999         Original published format: GB 9923500
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091575
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091575
Date:17.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:Verbesserungen für einen elektronischen Programmführer[2001/15]
English:Improvements relating to an electronic programme guide[2001/15]
French:Améliorations apportées à un guide de programmes électronique[2001/15]
Examination procedure07.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
15.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2010Fee for grant paid
27.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011  21.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V.
Hohenzollernstr. 11-13
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Pröll, Jürgen
Die Patenterie GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstraße 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011  21.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V.
Hohenzollernstr. 11-13
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Pröll, Jürgen
Maryniok & Eichstädt Anwaltssozietät Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2011/39]
Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V.
Hohenzollernstr. 11-13
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok & Eichstädt Mühläckerstrasse 4a
96117 Memmelsdorf / DE
28.09.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.02.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
16.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.12.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0358/14
22.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
23.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
16.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.11.2010
BE17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
DK17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
NL17.11.2010
SE17.11.2010
GR18.02.2011
PT17.03.2011
IE04.10.2011
LU04.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2011/40]AT17.11.2010
BE17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
DK17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
NL17.11.2010
SE17.11.2010
GR18.02.2011
PT17.03.2011
Former [2011/35]AT17.11.2010
BE17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
NL17.11.2010
SE17.11.2010
GR18.02.2011
PT17.03.2011
Former [2011/31]AT17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
NL17.11.2010
SE17.11.2010
GR18.02.2011
PT17.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
NL17.11.2010
SE17.11.2010
PT17.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0721253  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1,2,7,11-13,18,20,21 * column 8, line 22 - line 51 *;
 [X]EP0802673  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,7,9,11-13,18,20,21 * figure 8 *;
 [X]EP0774866  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS) [X] 1,2,7,11-13,18,20,21 * column 2, line 1 - line 25 *;
 [X]WO9718670  (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA ;BEDARD KAREN (US)) [X] 1,2,7,9,20,21 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0790738  (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,7,20,21 * column 14, line 22 - line 48; figures 12A-12C *;
 [X]WO9806219  (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC) [X] 1,2,7,20,21 * page 21, line 2 - line 20; figures 11-14 *;
 [X]EP0889647  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,20 * page 18, line 15 - line 45 *;
 [A]WO9750251  (NEWS AMERICA PUBLICATIONS INC ;TELECOMMUNICATIONS OF COLORADO (US)) [A] 8 * page 19, line 13 - line 33 *