Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091342

EP1091342 - Display technique of high grey scale [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Yukio
19-A-104,Misasagitayamacho,Yaishina-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8405 / JP
02 / Komori, Kazunori
4-6-4-1007.Suzukakedai
Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1322 / JP
03 / Nishiyama, Kazuhiro
33-10,Shakusonjicho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0081 / JP
04 / Takimoto, Akio
4-1,Kunimatsucho
Neyagawa-shi, Osala 572-0016 / JP
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00308720.204.10.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateJP1999028276704.10.1999         Original published format: JP 28276799
JP1999028436705.10.1999         Original published format: JP 28436799
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091342
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091342
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/34, G09G3/36
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/37]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Technik zur Anzeige einer hohen Anzahl von Graustufen[2001/15]
English:Display technique of high grey scale[2001/15]
French:Technique d'affichage d'un nombre élevé de niveaux de gris[2001/15]
Examination procedure18.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/14]
01.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/46]
07.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9410675  (RANK BRIMAR LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,15-32,38,48,55-58,60,74-77,81,86,87,90-92 * page 3, line 1 - line 17 * * page 9, line 10 - page 13, line 17 * * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 19 *;
 [X]US5748164  (HANDSCHY MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14-20,48,55-58,60,74-77,81,86,87,90-92 * column 1, line 13 - line 33; figure 16 * * column 5, line 50 - column 11, line 30 * * column 14, line 66 - column 17, line 8 * * column 18, line 45 - column 19, line 20 * * column 21, line 29 - column 22, line 67 * * column 23, line 48 - column 25, line 16 * * column 27, line 23 - line 41 *;
 [XY]EP0889458  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,12,13,15,16,18,19,39,42,43,48,55-60,74-77,81,86,87,90-92 * column 1, line 27 - line 36 * * column 6, line 4 - column 8, line 45; figure 5 * * column 11, line 19 - line 35 * * column 13, line 25 - line 37 * [Y] 40,41;
 [Y]US5128660  (DEMOND THOMAS W [US], et al) [Y] 40,41 * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 9 * * column 14, line 3 - line 30; figure 5C *;
 [A]US5666173  (MASE AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 43,59 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 17 * * column 14, line 22 - column 15, line 9; figure 8 *;
 [X]JPH0371111  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 44,45,47;
 [Y]US6268843  (ARAKAWA SATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 46 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 67 *;
 [X]US4758818  (VATNE ROLF S [US]) [X] 44,45 * column 5, line 8 - line 38; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US4090219  (ERNSTOFF MICHAEL N, et al) [Y] 46 * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 56 *;
 [X]US5298915  (BASSETTI JR CHESTER F [US]) [X] 61,62,73,86,88,89 * column 6, line 3 - column 10, line 59; figure 2B *;
 [XAY]EP0848369  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 61,73 * page 2, line 10 - line 46 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 43 * * page 7, line 26 - line 32 * [A] 65 [Y] 88,89;
 [XY]US5122791  (GIBBONS DAVID J [GB], et al) [X] 86 * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 60; figures 6,8 * [Y] 88,89;
 [X]US5959598  (MCKNIGHT DOUGLAS J [US]) [X] 15,33-37,49-54,86,92-96 * column 3, line 23 - line 37 * * column 9, line 5 - column 11, line 39 * * column 14, line 61 - column 16, line 42 * * column 20, line 29 - line 42 *;
 [XA]US5225823  (KANALY DAVID B [US]) [X] 74-80 * column 6, line 51 - column 8, line 15; figures 9,11 * [A] 82-85;
 [A]EP0261899  (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [A] 78-80,82-85,53,54,93-96 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 47; figure 7 *;
 [A]US5828357  (TAMAI SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 78,79 * column 3, line 1 - line 39; figure 23 * * column 13, line 21 - column 14, line 4; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5705424  (ZAVRACKY PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 82-85 * abstract *