EP1221713 - Mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okazaki National Research Institutes 38, Nishigonaka, Myodaiji-Cho Okazaki City Aichi-Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Okazaki National Research Institutes 38, Nishigonaka, Myodaiji-Cho Okazaki City, Aichi-Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishi, Nobuyuki 6-90, Dojogairi, Myodaiji-Cho Okazak City, Aichi Ref. / JP | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | ||
Former [2002/28] | Abrams, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308933.1 | 11.10.2000 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | JP20000242002 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000242002 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221713 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221713 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/16, H01J49/40 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
H01J49/0431 (EP,US);
H01J49/0418 (EP,US);
Y10T436/14 (EP,US);
Y10T436/141111 (EP,US);
Y10T436/142222 (EP,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/33] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Massenspektrometrie | [2002/28] | English: | Mass spectrometry | [2002/28] | French: | Spectrométrie de masse | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 08.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09326243 ; | [A]JPS60146438 ; | [A]US4740298 (ANDRESEN BRIAN D [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5770272 (BIEMANN KLAUS [US], et al) [Y] 1,11 * column 7, lines 6-35; claim 1 * * column 13, lines 34-36 *; | [Y]WO9853308 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US]) [Y] 1,11 * figure 13b; claims 1,8,23-29 *; | [A] - PERERA I K ET AL, "Some characteristics of matrix-assisted UV laser desorption/ionization mass spectrometric analysis of large proteins", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY AND ION PROCESSES, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19961210), vol. 156, no. 3, ISSN 0168-1176, pages 151 - 172, XP004071128 [A] 1,11 * page 154 - page 155 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1176(96)04431-X | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09326243 A 19971216 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851206), vol. 009, no. 310, Database accession no. (E - 364), & JP60146438 A 19850802 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |