EP1099930 - Gyroscope and input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | For all designated states ESASHI, Masayoshi 11-9, Yagiyamaminami 1-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi-ken 982 / JP | [2006/24] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | ||
For all designated states ESASHI, Masayoshi 11-9, Yagiyamaminami 1-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken 982 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Munemitsu, c/o Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | 02 /
Shinohara, Eiji, c/o Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | 03 /
Esashi, Masayoshi 1-11-9 Yagiyamaminami, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309009.9 | 13.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | JP19990318873 | 09.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31887399 | JP19990320323 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32032399 | JP20000015052 | 24.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000015052 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099930 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099930 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099930 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P9/04 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G01C19/5628 (EP);
G01C19/00 (KR);
G01C19/5621 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/40] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kreisel und Eingabevorrichtung | [2001/20] | English: | Gyroscope and input device | [2001/20] | French: | Gyroscope et dispositif d'entrée | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.09.2006 | [2006/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4750364 (KAWAMURA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 13,14 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 9 * * column 4, line 2 - line 35 * * column 3, line 60 - line 66 * * column 3, line 3 - line 7 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US5821420 (CHO AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |