EP1094450 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usami, Yoshihisa, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 12-1 Ougi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Stevens, Jason Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309064.4 | 16.10.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | JP19990299359 | 21.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29935999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1094450 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1094450 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094450 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
G11B7/00745 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/46] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2001/17] | English: | Optical recording medium | [2001/17] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 28.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04195939 ; | [X]JPH09102143 ; | [X]JPH09259439 ; | [X]US5604726 (KARUBE HIROO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 26 - line 43 *; | [X]EP0818778 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1031975 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) [PX] 1-4,6-10* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921029), vol. 016, no. 527, Database accession no. (P - 1447), & JP04195939 A 19920715 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09102143 A 19970415 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09259439 A 19971003 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * |