Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101805

EP1101805 - Non-aqueous ball point pen ink and ball point pen using the ink [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot
1-8-1 Nishi-Gotanda, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8553 / JP
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Fujii, Takeshi, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot
Isezaki Plant, 1744-2, Naganuma-cho
Gunma / JP
02 / Funabashi, Kahori, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot
Isezaki Plant, 1744-2, Naganuma-cho
Gunma / JP
03 / Fukasawa, Teruaki, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot
Isezaki Plant, 1744-2, Naganuma-cho
Gunma / JP
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/13]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2001/21]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00309205.319.10.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateJP1999036520618.11.1999         Original published format: JP 36520699
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101805
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101805
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/18
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nichtwässrige Kugelschreibertinte und Kugelschreiber mit dieser Tinte[2001/21]
English:Non-aqueous ball point pen ink and ball point pen using the ink[2001/21]
French:Encre non aqueuse pour stylo-bille et stylo-bille contenant cette encre[2001/21]
Examination procedure14.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
27.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2004Fee for grant paid
21.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0806461  (KEDAH LIMITED [IE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 54-58; examples 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9740110  (INNOVA TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 20-23 * * page 4, line 5 * * page 4, lines 10,11 * * page 5, lines 20-22 * * page 9, line 8 - page 16, line 10 *;
 [A]EP0702066  (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]);
 [AD]JPH0948941  (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP])