Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1094061 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1094061



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 437
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.02.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.02.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
31.01.2011 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
31.01.2011 French translation of claims Opposition 1
31.01.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
03.11.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
03.11.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
03.11.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
03.11.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.10.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.07.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
10.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
20.05.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
12.04.2010 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
12.04.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.01.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.12.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
15.12.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
01.07.2008 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
24.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 4
03.12.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
01.10.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.06.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.05.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
15.05.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
08.05.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.04.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.04.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.04.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.03.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.03.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.02.2007 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.02.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
21.02.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.02.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.01.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2006 Claims Opposition 1
15.12.2006 Claims Opposition 1
15.12.2006 Claims Opposition 1
15.12.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.12.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
11.12.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.06.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
26.06.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
16.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
26.01.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.01.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.01.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
30.08.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.08.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.04.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.04.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.03.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.03.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.03.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.03.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.03.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
01.03.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.03.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
01.03.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.04.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.04.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
07.04.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.12.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.12.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.12.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
31.10.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
11.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
11.09.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2002 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.02.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
29.11.2001 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
24.09.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
03.05.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.03.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.03.2001 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.03.2001 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
09.01.2001 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.11.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.11.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 29
20.10.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
20.10.2000 Description Search / examination 25
20.10.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.10.2000 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.10.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6