Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096188

EP1096188 - Relief valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Tarazona, Antulio
38 Kirdford Close, Ifield
Crawley, West Sussex RH11 0DN / GB
02 / Smith, John Cambridge
Northpoint, The Driftway, Upper Beeding
Steyning, West Sussex BN44 3JX / GB
03 / Currington, Ian
25 Kingfisher Way
Horsham, West Sussex RH12 2LT / GB
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Rawlins, Kate Cecilia , et al
The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham
Surrey GU2 6HJ / GB
[2006/13]
Former [2001/18]Bousfield, Roger James , et al
The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Application number, filing date00309304.423.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateGB1999002564829.10.1999         Original published format: GB 9925648
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096188
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096188
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096188
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16K17/02, F16K31/08
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Überdruckventil[2001/18]
English:Relief valve[2001/18]
French:Soupape de surpression[2001/18]
Examination procedure07.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
19.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2005Fee for grant paid
26.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
IT06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
CY23.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
[2007/35]
Former [2007/20]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
CY23.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2007/08]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/48]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/30]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/22]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
SE06.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4750705  (ZIPPE GERNOT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 5,7,8;
 [Y]DE9314210U  (BASF MAGNETICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 14; figure . *;
 [Y]US3433256  (STILLHARD BRUNO, et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 3, line 4 - line 13; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE29700833U  (SCHWARTE WERK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 8 - line 23; figure .; claim 1 *;
 [XA]EP0273614  (EIDSMORE PAUL G) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 32; figure - * [A] 2,3;
 [X]WO9857082  (S F M SOPHISTICATED WATER METE [IL], et al) [X] 1 * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 3 *