Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099620

EP1099620 - Rear derailleur with cable guide roller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichida, Tadashi
3-4-2-208 Schinkanaoka
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2001/20]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Ltd., 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date00309461.227.10.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateUS1999043922412.11.1999         Original published format: US 439224
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099620
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099620
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099620
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B62M9/12, B62M25/02
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2004/09]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hintere Gangschaltung für Fahrrad mit über eine Rolle geführtem Kabel[2001/20]
English:Rear derailleur with cable guide roller[2001/20]
French:Dérailleur arrière pour bicyclette avec un câble guidé par une poulie[2001/20]
Examination procedure22.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
07.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE
14.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2004Fee for grant paid
10.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04018901.1  / EP1475300
EP04018902.9  / EP1475301
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]US4470823  (SHIMANO KEIZO [JP]) [XD] 1-4,7-14,19-21 * the whole document *;
 [XDA]US4306871  (NAGANO MASASHI) [XD] 1,2,7-14,21 * the whole document * [A] 19,20;
 [XA]EP0850828  (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-18,20,21 * the whole document * [A] 19;
 [XDA]US3979962  (KEBSCH ALEX) [XD] 20,21 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,7-11,15,16,18,19;
 [PA]EP1031503  (SHIMANO SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG]) [PA] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0771720  (AVID ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0878385  (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 8; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5620383  (PATTERSON SAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3748916  (MORSE M) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3979962
 US4306871
 US4470823