Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097990

EP1097990 - A mutant kanamycin nucleotidyltransferase and a method of screening thermophilic bacteria using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RIKEN
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Riken
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoyama, Sigeyuki
c/o Riken, 2-1 Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
02 / Hoseki, Jun
1-2-506 Takahata-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8202 / JP
03 / Yano, Takato
2-1-23-502 Higashitenman, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0044 / JP
04 / Koyama, Yoshinori
1-402-1007 Azuma
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0031 / JP
05 / Kuramitsu, Seiki
2-16-41 Miyayama-cho
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0056 / JP
06 / Kagamiyama, Hiroyuki
2-27-16 Koshienguchi
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8113 / JP
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2001/19]Maschio, Antonio
D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00309475.227.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateJP1999030961629.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30961699
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1097990
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1097990
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097990
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/12, C12N15/63, C12N15/52, C12N15/74
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2002/07]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mutante Kanamycin-Nukleotidyltransferase und deren Verwendung zum screening thermophiler Bakterien[2001/19]
English:A mutant kanamycin nucleotidyltransferase and a method of screening thermophilic bacteria using the same[2001/19]
French:Une kanamycine-nucleotidyltransferase mutante et une méthode de criblage de bacteries thermophyliques l'utilisant[2001/19]
Examination procedure16.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
06.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2004Fee for grant paid
25.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH28.07.2004
FR28.07.2004
IT28.07.2004
LI28.07.2004
[2007/35]
Former [2006/32]CH28.07.2004
FR28.07.2004
LI28.07.2004
Former [2005/21]CH28.07.2004
LI28.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[PX]  HOSEKI JUN ET AL, "Directed evolution of thermostable kanamycin-resistance gene: A convenient selection marker for Thermus thermophilus.", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY (TOKYO)., (199911), vol. 126, no. 5, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 951 - 956, XP002162891 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  MATSUMURA M ET AL, "SCREENING FOR THERMOSTABLE MUTANT OF KANAMYCIN NUCLEOTIDYLTRANSFERASE BY THE USE OF A TRANSFORMATION SYSTEM FOR A THERMOPHILE BACILLUS-STEAROTHERMOPHILUS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 260, no. 28, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15298 - 15303, XP002162892 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  LIAO HANS H, "Thermostable mutants of kanamycin nucleotidyltransferase are also more stable to proteinase K, urea, detergents, and water-miscible organic solvents.", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 286 - 292, XP002162893 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(93)90151-Q