EP1096369 - A counter readout control apparatus and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minami, Masahiro, NEC IC Microcomputer Syst. Ltd. 403-53 Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
OOtsuka, Shigekazu, NEC IC Microcomputer Syst. Ltd 403-53 Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309486.9 | 27.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990309259 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30925999 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096369 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096369 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/50, H03K21/40, G04F10/04 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G06F7/5055 (EP,US);
G06F9/00 (KR);
H03K21/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | G06F7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/51] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuergerät für Zahlerauslesung, und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2001/18] | English: | A counter readout control apparatus and control method therefor | [2001/18] | French: | Appareil à commander la lecture d'un compteur, et procédé de commande associé | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/07] | 15.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05191406 ; | [A]JPS57107641 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931112), vol. 017, no. 615, Database accession no. (E - 1459), & JP05191406 A 19930730 (FUJITSU LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821009), vol. 006, no. 200, Database accession no. (E - 135), & JP57107641 A 19820705 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - Computer translation of the description to English, from JPO at http://www.ipdl.jpo.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl, done on 8.1.2002. [A] 1,4,5,7 * the whole document * |