Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102398

EP1102398 - Generalised positioning system based on use of a statistical filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Syrjärinne, Jari
Yliopistonkatu, 45K 115
33500 Tampere / FI
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date00309541.130.10.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS1999044325922.11.1999         Original published format: US 443259
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102398
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1102398
Date:02.05.2002
[2002/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03H17/02, G01S1/04
[2002/18]
Former International [2001/21]H03H17/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
TitleGerman:Verallgemeinertes Positionierungssystem auf Basis von Benutzung eines statistischen Filters[2001/21]
English:Generalised positioning system based on use of a statistical filter[2001/21]
French:Système de positionnement généralisé basé sur l'utilisation d'un filtre statique[2001/21]
Examination procedure04.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
24.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
13.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5828336  (YUNCK THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 19 - column 4, line 62 *;
 [A]US5890068  (FATTOUCHE MICHEL T [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 47 * * claims 19-21 *