Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096385

EP1096385 - A method and apparatus for forming an entry address [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute for the Development of Emerging Architectures, L.L.C.
19447 Pruneridge Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Bryg, William R.
18630 Perego Way
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
02 / Hammond, Gary N.
5101 Sawgrass Court
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
03 / Burger, Stephen G.
257 Forbes Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
04 / Hays, James O.
1722 Campbell Avenue
San Jose, CA 95125 / US
05 / Huck, Jerome C.
851 Talisman Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
06 / Saxena, Sunil
156 Carlow Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
07 / Ross, Jonathan K.
19630 NE 125th Circle
Woodinville WA 98072 / US
08 / Yamada, Koichi
371 Elan Village Lane, No. 116
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
 [2001/20]
Former [2001/18]01 / Bryg, William R.
18630 Perego Way
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
02 / Hammond, Gary N.
5101 Sawgrass Court
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
03 / Burger, Stephen G.
257 Forbes Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
04 / Hays, James O.
1722 Campbell Avenue
San Jose, CA 95125 / US
05 / Huck, Jerome C.
851 Talisman Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
06 / Saxena, Sunil
156 Carlow Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
07 / Ross, Jonathan K.
974 Lorne Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
08 / Yamada, Koichi
371 Elan Village Lane, No. 116
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams, Powell & Associates, 4 St Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8AY / GB
Application number, filing date00309543.730.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999043079331.10.1999         Original published format: US 430793
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096385
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096385
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/10
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/04]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Eingabeadresse[2001/18]
English:A method and apparatus for forming an entry address[2001/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour former l'adresse d'une rubrique[2001/18]
Examination procedure02.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
10.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2003Fee for grant paid
31.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9844419  (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * page 11, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 3; figures 4,5 *;
 [DA]US5724538  (MORRIS DALE C [US], et al) [DA] 1,9 * column 5, line 33 - column 7, line 6; figure 6 *