Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102500

EP1102500 - Method and apparatus for a wireless telecommunications system that provides location-based action services [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.11.2008
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Richton, Robert Ellis
35 Crestview Avenue
Morris, New Jersey 07940 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/21]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00309805.006.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS1999044004815.11.1999         Original published format: US 440048
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102500
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1102500
Date:23.01.2002
[2002/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/22, H04M11/00
[2002/04]
Former International [2001/21]H04Q7/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2002/41]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für ein drahtloses Kommunikationssystem mit positionsbasierten Diensten[2001/21]
English:Method and apparatus for a wireless telecommunications system that provides location-based action services[2001/21]
French:Procédé et appareil pour un système de télécommunication sans fil fournissant des services localisés[2001/21]
Examination procedure15.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
23.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/01]
19.11.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/01]
Appeal following examination29.05.2004Appeal received No.  T0770/04
03.06.2004Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
15.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5461390  (HOSHEN JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-6,10-27,30-32,34-51,55-61 * column W *;
 [A]DE19747878  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-64 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [PX]WO0041412  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [PX] 1,22,25,48 * claims 1-5 *