EP1098376 - Organic EL device and image-reading, data-processing and display apparatus including the device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Tatsundo 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309881.1 | 07.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990316683 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31668399 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1098376 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1098376 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/20, H01L33/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H10K59/32 (EP,US);
H10K50/805 (US);
H10K59/805 (EP);
H10K85/324 (EP,US);
H10K85/60 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Organische EL Vorrichtung und Bildlese-, Datenverarbeitungsgerät, und Anzeigevorrichtung, mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2001/19] | English: | Organic EL device and image-reading, data-processing and display apparatus including the device | [2001/19] | French: | Dispositif organique EL et dispositif de lecture d'image, de traitement de données, et d'affichage, contenant ce dispositif | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH07114350 ; | [XY]JPH1012380 ; | [YA]US5757026 (FORREST STEPHEN ROSS [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * figure 2 * * column 3, lines 61-67 * * columns 4-6 * [A] 1-6; | [A]US5929562 (PICHLER KARL [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 56-61 * * column 2, lines 1-10 * * column 2, lines 29-37 * * column 5, lines 21-28 * * figures 2,3 ** figure 4 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07114350 A 19950502 (PIONEER ELECTRON CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 4 * * figure 12 * [A] 5,6 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10012380 A 19980116 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 1 * [Y] 7-9 |