Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102080

EP1102080 - Gradient coils for magnetic resonance imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marconi Medical Systems, Inc.
595 Miner Road Cleveland
Ohio 44143 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Marconi Medical Systems, Inc.
595 Miner Road
Cleveland, Ohio 44143 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Morich, Michael A.
7580 Jeremy Avenue
Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US
02 / Petropoulos, Labros S.
6559 Brookland Avenue
Solon, Ohio 44139 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2001/21]Waters, Jeffrey
Marconi Intellectual Property Waterhouse Lane
Chelmsford Essex CM1 2QX / GB
Application number, filing date00309902.508.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS1999044128316.11.1999         Original published format: US 441283
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102080
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1102080
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/385
[2001/21]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/09]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gradientenspulen für die bildgebende magnetische Resonanz[2001/21]
English:Gradient coils for magnetic resonance imaging[2001/21]
French:Bobines à gradient pour l'imagerie par résonance magnétique[2001/21]
Examination procedure05.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
01.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH09276247  ;
 [A]US5235279  (KAUFMAN LEON [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7-9 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 26 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5278504  (PATRICK JOHN L [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 4, line 21 - column 4, line 43 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 41; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5942898  (PETROPOULOS LABROS S [US], et al) [A] 2,5,8 * column 5, line 61 - column 10, line 32; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5977771  (PETROPOULOS LABROS S [US]) [A] 5,8 * column 4, line 39 - column 10, line 20; figure 1 *
 [PX]  - L.S.PETROPOULOS, "Phased Array Planar Gradient Sets for MRI systems with Vertical directed fields", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, EIGHTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, DENVER, COLORADO, USA, 1-7 APRIL 2000, vol. 1, page 333, XP002237163 [PX] 1-5,7-10 * conference abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract * [A] 8-10
 [XA]  - HARVEY P R ET AL, "MODULAR GRADIENT COIL: A NEW CONCEPT IN HIGH-PERFORMANCE WHOLE-BODYGRADIENT COIL DESIGN", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (199909), vol. 42, no. 3, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 561 - 570, XP000859169 [X] 1-5,7 * see pages 564,565,569 * [A] 8-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2594(199909)42:3<561::AID-MRM19>3.0.CO;2-0