Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099776

EP1099776 - Plasma cleaning step in a salicide process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Saigal, Dinesh
3287 Mirage Way
San Jose, CA 95135 / US
02 / King, Rochelle
10 Breaker Lane
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
03 / Singhal, Ajay
3480 Granada Avenue, No. 106
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00309958.709.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateUS1999043757309.11.1999         Original published format: US 437573
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099776
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/02, H01L21/306, H01L21/336, H01L21/285, H01L21/3205
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/07]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Plasma-Reinigungsschritt in einem Salizid-Verfahren[2001/20]
English:Plasma cleaning step in a salicide process[2001/20]
French:Etape de nettoyage par plasma dans un procédé de salicidation[2001/20]
Examination procedure16.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
14.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0452888  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,13,19 * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * * column 3, line 15 - line 37 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, line 32 - line 47; figure 2 * * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 5 * * column 8, line 3 - line 34; figures 3-5 * [A] 10,12 [Y] 14-16;
 [X]US4585517  (STEMPLE DONALD K [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12,13,19 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 1, line 27 - line 68 * * column 2, line 1 - line 28 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 26; figure 1 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 17 *;
 [XY]US5899720  (MIKAGI KAORU [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-11 * column 1, line 9 - line 28 * * column 4, line 1 - line 12 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 56; figure 2A * * column 6, line 5 - line 14 * * column 6, line 23 - line 36; figures 2B,2C * [Y] 5,14,17,18;
 [YA]JPS56169776  ;
 [Y]JPS56155526  ;
 [A]JPS56155526  ;
 [A]EP0349695  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,3,5-9,12-15,19 * column 1, line 1 - line 12 * * column 2, line 26 - line 51 * * column 3, line 19 - line 27 *;
 [A]US4647361  (BAUER HANS J [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-8,12,14,17,18 * column 1, line 5 - line 14 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 36 * * column 7, line 13 - line 45 * * column 8, line 8 - line 18 * * column 12, line 18 - line 49 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820414), vol. 006, no. 057, Database accession no. (C - 098), & JP56169776 A 19811226 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 14-16 * abstract * [A] 1,5,6
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820306), vol. 006, no. 037, Database accession no. (E - 097), & JP56155526 A 19811201 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI) [Y] 5,14,17,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - S. YAMAZAKI, DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 01, Database accession no. 1982-00900E, & JPS56155526 A 19811201 (S.YAMAZAKI) [A] 1,6,11-19 * abstract *