Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102317

EP1102317 - Organic EL display apparatus and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.05.2013  [2013/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Urabe, Tetsuo
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sasaoka, Tatsuya
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Sekiya, Mitsunobu
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Yamagagishi, Machio
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00310216.717.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateJP1999032981019.11.1999         Original published format: JP 32981099
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102317
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1102317
Date:24.03.2004
[2004/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/00, H01L51/20
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2004/51]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Organische EL Anzeigevorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren[2001/21]
English:Organic EL display apparatus and manufacturing method thereof[2001/21]
French:Dispositif d'affichage EL organique et procédé de fabrication[2001/21]
Examination procedure03.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/45]
09.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2008Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/20]
05.03.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/20]
Appeal following examination03.09.2008Appeal received No.  T0425/09
22.01.2009Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
05.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0895219  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,8 * column 3, paragraph 11 * * column 11, paragraph 32 - paragraph 33 * * column 13, paragraph 42; figure 6A * * column 14, paragraph 43 - column 15, paragraph 45 * [Y] 7;
 [Y]EP0883190  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 5 - line 21 * * column 3, line 49 - line 53 * * column 4, line 2 - line 5 * * column 4, line 12 - line 16 * * column 7, line 20 - line 27 * * figure 1 * * column 11, line 2 - line 8 *