Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101455

EP1101455 - Stent delivery system with a fixed guide wire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cordis Corporation
40 Technology Drive
Warren, NJ 07040 / US
[2003/45]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Fischell, Robert E.
14600 Viburnum Drive
Dayton, Maryland 21036 / US
For all designated states
Fischell, David R.
71 Riverlawn Drive
Fair Haven, NJ 07704 / US
For all designated states
Fischell, Tim A.
06447 Whitney Woods
Richland, MI 49083 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHELL, Robert E.
14600 Viburnum Drive
Dayton, MD 21036 / US
02 / FISCHELL, David R.
71 Riverlawn Drive
Fair Haven, NJ 07704 / US
03 / FISCHELL, Tim A.
1701 Embury Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US
 [2005/43]
Former [2004/10]01 / FISCHELL, Robert E.
14600 Virburnum Drive
Dayton, MD 21036 / US
02 / FISCHELL, David R.
71 Riverlawn Drive
Fair Haven, NJ 07704 / US
03 / FISCHELL, Tim A.
1701 Embury Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US
Former [2004/01]01 / FISCHELL, Robert E.
14600 Virburnum Drive
Dayton, MD 21036 / US
02 / FISCHELL, David R.
71 Riverlawn Drive
Fair Haven, NJ 07704 / US
03 / FISCHELL, Tim A.
6447 Whitney Woods
Richland, MI 49083 / US
Former [2003/46]01 / FISCHELL, Robert E.
14600 Virburnum Drive
Dayton, MD 21036 / US
02 / FISCHELL, David R.
71 Riverlawn Drive
FairHaven, NJ 07704 / US
03 / FISCHELL, Tim A.
6447 Whitney Woods
Richland, MI 49083 / US
Former [2001/21]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00310271.220.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS1999044410422.11.1999         Original published format: US 444104
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101455
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101455
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101455
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/21]
Extension statesAL18.08.2003
LT18.08.2003
LV18.08.2003
MK18.08.2003
RO18.08.2003
SI18.08.2003
TitleGerman:Stenteinbringungssystem mit festem Führungsdraht[2001/21]
English:Stent delivery system with a fixed guide wire[2001/21]
French:Système de délivrance de stent muni d'un fil fixe de guidage[2001/21]
Examination procedure18.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/49]
03.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2005Fee for grant paid
28.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
CY08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
TR08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
AT20.11.2006
GB20.11.2006
IE20.11.2006
LU20.11.2006
ES21.11.2006
FR30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/36]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
TR08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
AT20.11.2006
GB20.11.2006
IE20.11.2006
LU20.11.2006
ES21.11.2006
FR30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/23]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
AT20.11.2006
GB20.11.2006
IE20.11.2006
ES21.11.2006
FR30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/19]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
AT20.11.2006
GB20.11.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/13]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
AT20.11.2006
GB20.11.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/51]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
GB20.11.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/50]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/48]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
IT08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/37]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
IT08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/35]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
IT08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2007/13]BE08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2007/09]CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2007/08]CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
Former [2006/46]CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
SE08.06.2006
Former [2006/42]CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
Former [2006/36]FI08.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9639999  (ENDOVASCULAR TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,13,22 * page 11, line 27 - line 29 * * page 12, line 19 - line 28 * * page 13, line 1 - line 2 * * page 13, line 19 - line 30 * * page 14, line 16 - line 22 * * figures 3,9 * [A] 4-12,14,19,21;
 [XA]EP0508473  (ENDOVASCULAR TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,22 * column 5, line 50 - line 54 * * column 9, line 8 - line 14 * * figure 1 * [A] 5-13,19-21