Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103410

EP1103410 - Anchor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Controls GmbH
Industriestrasse 20-30
51399 Burscheid / DE
[2001/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Rodger, c/o Johnson Controls Automotive Ltd
Stafford Park 6, Telford
Shropshire, TF3 3RQ / GB
02 / Leon, Pacho, c/o Johnson Controls Automotive Ltd
The Hamilton Centre, Rodney Way, Widford
Chelmsford, Essex, CM1 3BY / GB
03 / Taylor, Alex, c/o Johnson Controls Automotive Ltd
Stafford Park 6, Telford
Shropshire, TF3 3RQ / GB
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Dealtry, Brian
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Dealtry, Brian
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date00310439.524.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateGB1999002785526.11.1999         Original published format: GB 9927855
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1103410
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1103410
Date:17.09.2003
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/015, B60N2/07
[2003/38]
Former International [2001/22]B60N2/015, B60N2/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/24]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ankeranordnung[2001/22]
English:Anchor assembly[2001/22]
French:Ensemble d'ancrage[2001/22]
Examination procedure17.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
01.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2007Fee for grant paid
19.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/36]
20.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB261460  (ARTHUR WILLIAM CHAPMAN) [X] 1,3 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 43; figure 1 * [Y] 5;
 [X]JPH10181392  ;
 [XY]FR2762815  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 6, line 14 - page 12, line 4; figures 2-6A * [Y] 5;
 [XY]EP0949112  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 5, line 3 - column 10, line 28; figures 4-6 * [Y] 5;
 [A]FR2771348  (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, [X] 1,6,10,11 * abstract *