Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164562

EP1164562 - White balance correction circuit and correction method for display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Maxell, Ltd.
1-88, Ushitora 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8567 / JP
[2015/21]
Former [2013/30]For all designated states
Hitachi Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
1815-1, Ohaza Tajiri Kunitomi-cho Higashimorokata-gun
Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
Kanagawa Science Park, 3-2-1 Sakado, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kumakura, Ken, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
02 / Kimura, Y., Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
03 / Noguchi, Y, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
04 / Ooe, T. Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
05 / Ohki, H., Hitachi Video and Information System, Inc
292, Yoshidacho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohma-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2013/21]
Former [2001/51]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00310546.728.11.2000
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateJP2000006399108.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000063991
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1164562
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1164562
Date:06.04.2005
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/28, G09G5/02
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/52]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Korrektur des Weissabgleichs einer Anzeigeeinrichtung[2001/51]
English:White balance correction circuit and correction method for display apparatus[2001/51]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la correction de l'équilibre du blanc pour dispositif d'affichage[2001/51]
Examination procedure04.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/48]
16.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.07.2016
14.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31]
24.03.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31]
15.07.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP07116252.3  / EP1906379
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
05.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201516   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [] - No Search
by applicantJPH09281927
 JPH0851642