blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1207146

EP1207146 - Process for the conversion of 1,4 butynediol to 1, 4 butenediol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Council of Scientific and Industrial Research
Rafi Marg
New Delhi 110 001 / IN
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH
Rafi Marg
New Delhi 110 001 / IN
Former [2002/21]For all designated states
Council of Scientific and Industrial Research
Rafi Marg
New Delhi 110 001 / IN
Inventor(s)01 / Chaudhari, Raghunath Vitthal
National Chemical Laboratory, Pune 411 008
Maharashtra / IN
02 / Rode, Chandrashekhar Vasant
National Chemical Laboratory, Pune 411 008
Maharashtra / IN
03 / Jaganathan, Rengaswamy
National Chemical Laboratory, Pune 411 008
Maharashtra / IN
04 / Telkar, Manisha Madhukar
National Chemical Laboratory, Pune 411 008
Maharashtra / IN
05 / Rane, Vilas Hari
National Chemical Laboratory, Pune 411 008
Maharashtra / IN
 [2002/21]
Representative(s)Manaton, Ross Timothy, et al
Bromhead Johnson LLP
57-59 High Street
Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Manaton, Ross Timothy, et al
Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London
WC2 6EF / GB
Former [2004/23]Manaton, Ross Timothy, et al
Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Former [2002/21]Manaton, Ross Timothy
JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Application number, filing date00310557.429.11.2000
[2002/21]
Priority number, dateUS2000071670720.11.2000         Original published format: US 716707
[2002/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1207146
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1207146
Date:19.11.2003
[2003/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1207146
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2003
ClassificationIPC:C07C29/17, C07C33/035
[2002/21]
CPC:
C07C29/17 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C29/17, C07C33/035 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Umsetzung von 1,4-Butindiol in 1,4-Butendiol[2002/21]
English:Process for the conversion of 1,4 butynediol to 1, 4 butenediol[2002/21]
French:Procédé pour la conversion de butyne-1,4-diol en butène-1,4-diol[2002/21]
Examination procedure18.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/29]
24.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2007Fee for grant paid
05.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
CY25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
TR25.07.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
IE29.11.2007
LU29.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
CY25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
IE29.11.2007
LU29.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2009/33]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
CY25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
IE29.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/48]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
IE29.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/29]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/28]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/23]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/19]AT25.07.2007
BE25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/13]AT25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI25.07.2007
NL25.07.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/09]NL25.07.2007
ES05.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES05.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE1213839  (SNAM) [DX] 1-5,7 * example 4 *;
 [DA]US4001344  (HOFFMANN HERWIG, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4273944  (OHNO SHIGERU, et al) [A] 1* claims 1,3,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.