Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103687

EP1103687 - A nursery gate hinge and a nursery gate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2008
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Martin Yaffe International Limited
Arrow Mill Queensway
Rochdale, Lancashire OL11 2QN / GB
[2005/29]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
BELDRAY LIMITED
P.O. Box 20 Mount Pleasant
Bilston, West Midlands WV14 7NF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ROGERS, John
2 Canberra Drive
Stafford, Staffordshire ST16 3PX / GB
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)White, Nicholas John , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester
M2 3LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/50]White, Nicholas John , et al
MARKS & CLERK 43 Park Place
Leeds, LS1 2RY / GB
Former [2005/17]Jenkins, Richard Gavin , et al
Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place
Leeds LS1 2RY / GB
Former [2001/22]Croston, David , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00310569.929.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateGB1999002807529.11.1999         Original published format: GB 9928075
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1103687
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1103687
Date:11.12.2002
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103687
Date:07.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:E05D11/00, E06B9/04, E06B7/36
[2002/50]
Former International [2001/22]E05D11/00, E06B9/04
Designated contracting statesGB [2003/36]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsgitter für Kinder[2001/22]
English:A nursery gate hinge and a nursery gate[2001/22]
French:Porte de Nursery[2001/22]
Examination procedure22.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/30]
12.06.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
01.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
20.03.2007Fee for grant paid
20.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42]
Request for further processing for:20.03.2007Request for further processing filed
20.03.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.03.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
17.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2003
30.11.200405   M06   Fee paid on   02.03.2005
30.11.200607   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US5657809  (LONGORIA JOSE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-13 * column 4, line 49 - line 62 * * figures 6-8 *