Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1115107

EP1115107 - Method of manufacturing an optical information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/28]Optical information recording medium and method of manufacturing same
[2004/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.02.2006  [2006/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0193 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP
Former [2001/28]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Usami, Yoshihisa, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
12-1 Ohgi-cho, 2-chome
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0001 / JP
 [2001/28]
Representative(s)Stevens, Jason Paul
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/28]Stevens, Jason Paul
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date00311139.013.12.2000
[2001/28]
Priority number, dateJP1999035435014.12.1999         Original published format: JP 35435099
[2001/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1115107
Date:11.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1115107
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1115107
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/26, G11B7/00, G01N21/95
[2002/33]
Former International [2001/28]G11B7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/30]
Former [2001/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Methode zur Herstellung eines optischen Informationsspeichermediums[2004/22]
English:Method of manufacturing an optical information recording medium[2004/22]
French:Méthode de fabrication de support d'enregistrement optique d'information[2004/22]
Former [2001/28]Optisches Informationsspeichermedium und Methode zu seiner Herstellung
Former [2001/28]Optical information recording medium and method of manufacturing same
Former [2001/28]Support d'enregistrement optique d'information et méthode de son fabrication
Examination procedure25.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
07.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2004Fee for grant paid
11.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03022239.2  / EP1378900
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5715051  (LUSTER SPENCER D [US]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3;
 [YA]JPH04102983  ;
 [A]JPH03280232  ;
 [YA]EP0840307  (TAIYOYUDEN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * column 7, line 36 - column 9, line 46; figures 1,3; table 1 * [A] 5-8;
 [YA]US5627817  (ROSEN HAL J [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 65; figures 5,6; tables 1,2 * [A] 5-8;
 [A]US5721386  (MARETTE GILLES [FR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920723), vol. 016, no. 341, Database accession no. (P - 1391), [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920316), vol. 016, no. 105, Database accession no. (P - 1325), [A] 1-3 * abstract *