Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1111076 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2002 | A3 | EP1111076 | 27.06.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9930327 | 23.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2358407 | 25.07.2001 | A | GB9930327D0 | 09.02.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9930327 | 23.12.1999 |