Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1111076

EP1111076 - Telescopic dross pot [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J. McIntyre (Machinery) Limited
Harrimans Lane Dunkirk
Nottingham NG7 2SD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
J. McIntyre (Machinery) Limited
Harrimans Lane
Dunkirk Nottingham NG7 2SD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Bramley, Alan
c/o J. McIntyre (Machinery) Ltd. Harrimans Lane
Dunkirk, Nottingham NG7 2SD / GB
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/26]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date00311324.818.12.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateGB1999003032723.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9930327
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1111076
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1111076
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:C22B21/00, F27D23/00
[2001/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL [2003/31]
Former [2001/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Teleskopische Krätzepfanne[2001/26]
English:Telescopic dross pot[2001/26]
French:Creuset a laitier téléscopique[2001/26]
Examination procedure28.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
07.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[EA]US6228319  (ROTH DAVID J [US], et al) [E] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3;
 [XA]JPH07216471  ;
 [PXA]WO0031482  (STRATEGY ALUMINIUM JERSEY LIMI [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * page 12, line 19 - line 33 * * figures 4-6; claims 1,17-19 * [A] 2;
 [A]JPH08283880
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 2
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 3-5 *