Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1114992

EP1114992 - Device and method for hydrogen collection and detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ion Science Limited
The Way Fowlmere
Cambridge SG8 7UJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/28]For all designated states
Ion Science Limited
The Way
Fowlmere, Cambridge SG8 7UJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Dean, Frank William Houlton
5 Gwydir Street
Cambridge CB1 2LG / GB
02 / Ling, Alan Edward
31 High Street
Foxton, Cambridge CB2 6SP / GB
 [2001/28]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy
Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2003/18]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road
Bushey Heath, Herts WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2001/28]Hooper, John Peter Lindesay
5 Haslingfield Road
Harlton, Cambridge CB3 7ER / GB
Application number, filing date00311501.120.12.2000
[2001/28]
Priority number, dateGB2000000001605.01.2000         Original published format: GB 0000016
[2001/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1114992
Date:11.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1114992
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1114992
Date:25.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/24, G01N33/20, G01N33/00
[2002/36]
Former International [2001/28]G01N1/24, G01N33/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/21]
Former [2001/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anordnung und Verfahren zum Sammeln und Feststellen von Wasserstoff[2001/28]
English:Device and method for hydrogen collection and detection[2001/28]
French:Dispositif et méthode pour recueillir et détecter de l'hydrogène[2001/28]
Examination procedure07.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/11]
15.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2005Fee for grant paid
25.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200203   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.05.2005
CH25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
IT25.05.2005
LI25.05.2005
TR25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
GR25.08.2005
PT27.10.2005
CY20.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
[2007/35]
Former [2007/20]AT25.05.2005
CH25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
LI25.05.2005
TR25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
GR25.08.2005
PT27.10.2005
CY20.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2007/08]AT25.05.2005
CH25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
LI25.05.2005
TR25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
GR25.08.2005
PT27.10.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/51]AT25.05.2005
CH25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
LI25.05.2005
TR25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
GR25.08.2005
PT27.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/40]AT25.05.2005
CH25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
LI25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
GR25.08.2005
PT27.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT25.05.2005
CH25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
LI25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
GR25.08.2005
PT27.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT25.05.2005
FI25.05.2005
DK25.08.2005
Former [2005/52]FI25.05.2005
Documents cited:Search[DXA]GB2312279  (ION SCIENCE LTD [GB]) [DX] 1,2 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 2 * * page 27 - page 28; figure 5; claims 1,4,7,8 * * page 16, line 18 - page 17, line 7; claims 16,17 * * page 17, line 8 - line 18; figure 6 * [A] 2 [X] 1,2;
 [A]US4820920  (BATHER JOHN M [GB]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 53 - line 65; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5279169  (FREEMAN H BRUCE [CA]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 19 - line 39; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2660053  (BUEHNER HOWARD A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 4 - line 35; figure - *;
 [A]US5517026  (SICKENBERGER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 3; figure 3 *